U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gilliland, et. al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 06, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 02, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • August 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • August 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 15, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 15, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • August 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue Other]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • May 26, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 22, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 18, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 13, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 10, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 10, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 03, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 17, 2021: [Reset Docket Call and Excludable]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 16, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 16, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 16, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 08, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • June 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 27, 2021: [Bond]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 27, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 25, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 19, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 03, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 03, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 28, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 12, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2021: [Bond]
  • March 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 10, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 09, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • March 09, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 05, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 04, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 04, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 04, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • March 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.