U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Document]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 04, 2022: [Sentencing ]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 14, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 22, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.