U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00185-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morales-Guardado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Sentencing ]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 14, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 05, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.