U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acevedo-Calzada
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Dismiss ]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • September 23, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • March 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.