U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quinn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Seal ]
  • November 23, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 02, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • July 28, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 07, 2021: [Suppress ]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 19, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 14, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.