U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mills
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 15, 2022: [Opinion from USCA]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Document]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 03, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [USCA Case Number ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sentencing ]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • August 01, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 07, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • June 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 16, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 15, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 14, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 11, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 11, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.