U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Request]
  • January 10, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2022: [Sentencing ]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 10, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 22, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 22, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 22, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 26, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.