U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McNeill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 13, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [USCA Case Number ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Sentencing ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 17, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • July 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • May 16, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 26, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 18, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.