U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Glenn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Sentencing ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Seal ]
  • January 10, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • February 24, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • February 24, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • February 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 17, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.