U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00191-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Zelaya-Mejia et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 20, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • September 12, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Document]
  • September 01, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 12, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 04, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 04, 2022: [USCA Order]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 21, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 18, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • July 18, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Sentencing ]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Modification to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • June 09, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 01, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • June 01, 2022: [Jury Verdict ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • June 01, 2022: [Jury Trial ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Voir Dire and Jury Trial]
  • May 31, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 29, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • April 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • April 26, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • April 24, 2022: [Witness List]
  • April 24, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • April 24, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • April 24, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • April 22, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sequester]
  • April 19, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • April 19, 2022: [404(b) Evidence]
  • April 19, 2022: [Sequester]
  • April 19, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Reminder to Counsel - Judge Boyle]
  • April 18, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 18, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 02, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 07, 2022: [Seal ]
  • February 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 29, 2021: [Seal ]
  • November 29, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 17, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 27, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Text Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 25, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Ex Parte Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 16, 2021: [Seal ]
  • August 16, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 19, 2021: [Revoke]
  • June 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 01, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • April 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 08, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Text Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.