U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spencer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Mandate - USCA]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Opinion - USCA]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 01, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
December, 2021
  • December 11, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 03, 2021: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order - Other - USCA]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order - Other - USCA]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Electronic Record Transmitted]
  • August 30, 2021: [Case Number - USCA]
  • August 19, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 04, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2021: [Claim]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 11, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 10, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 10, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 10, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 10, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 04, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 04, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.