U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Probation]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order of Garnishment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Proposed Order]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Certificate of Service ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • June 22, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • June 21, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Judgment ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • September 27, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • March 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.