U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Piper et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Vacate (2255) ]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 16, 2022: [Acquittal ]
  • December 16, 2022: [New Trial ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 08, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 05, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Jury Verdict ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Jury Trial ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Jury Selection]
  • December 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 01, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Witness List]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • November 30, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Sever Defendant]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Adopt Motions of Co-defendants]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Relief]
  • November 29, 2022: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 28, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 27, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
  • November 27, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 25, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • November 25, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • November 25, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 25, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • November 25, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
  • November 24, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 23, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • November 23, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Ex Parte Document]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 16, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • November 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 16, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Discovery ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Adopt Motions of Co-defendants]
  • November 04, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • November 04, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Courtroom Technology Certification of Training]
  • August 01, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 11, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for evidence under Rule 404(b)]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sequester]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Jenks Material]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • April 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 08, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 06, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Sever Defendant]
  • November 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 24, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Exclude]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sever Defendant]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sequester]
  • September 07, 2021: [Jenks Material]
  • September 07, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • September 07, 2021: [404(b) Evidence]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 06, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 02, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 07, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 22, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 12, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 05, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 05, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 05, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.