U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 09, 2023: [USCA Case Number ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notification to Appeals Court of Filing]
  • January 08, 2023: [Judgment ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sentencing ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 01, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • November 16, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 15, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 14, 2022: [Seal ]
  • November 14, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 01, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 08, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 25, 2022: [Jury Verdict ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Voir Dire and Jury Trial]
  • August 24, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • August 20, 2022: [Reminder to Counsel - Judge Boyle]
  • August 19, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 19, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • August 19, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
  • August 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 15, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 10, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 10, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 04, 2022: [Certificate of Service ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 25, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 08, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 28, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 28, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 05, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 05, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.