U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00027-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Ugberaese et. al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Supplemental Record Sent USCA ]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 24, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 10, 2022: [Seal ]
  • March 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • March 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 30, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Seal ]
  • December 29, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 20, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • October 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 13, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 14, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • March 26, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 12, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • March 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.