U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 10, 2023: [Jury Verdict ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Jury Trial ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Voir Dire and Jury Trial]
  • January 09, 2023: [In Limine ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Dismiss ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Sequester]
  • January 06, 2023: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • January 06, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 05, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sequester]
  • January 05, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 03, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 02, 2023: [Reminder to Counsel - Judge Boyle]
  • January 01, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • January 01, 2023: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • January 01, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 28, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 16, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 02, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • April 06, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 06, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 06, 2022: [Indictment ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 11, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 11, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • December 28, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 11, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 11, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 11, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • September 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • August 08, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Produce ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice-other]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 05, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 05, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 05, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 05, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.