U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Freeman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sentencing ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 17, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • October 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 27, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 23, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 05, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 05, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 05, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.