U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arreola et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Memorandum and Recommendations]
October, 2022
  • October 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 12, 2022: [Objection to Memorandum and Recommendations]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • August 26, 2022: [Memorandum and Recommendations]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Travel ]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 18, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • January 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 29, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 29, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • December 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 06, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 06, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 06, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • November 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Rule 20 - Transfer Out]
  • November 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 12, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 04, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Reply to Response ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • September 11, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 06, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 30, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • August 30, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 27, 2021: [Transcript]
  • August 10, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 09, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Remark]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Correction]
  • August 04, 2021: [Response in Support]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 14, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 14, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 16, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Discovery ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Request]
  • June 08, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • June 07, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
May, 2021
  • May 31, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Suppress ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 22, 2021: [Document]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 20, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 20, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 15, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • April 15, 2021: [Appear]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • March 29, 2021: [Appear]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 10, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 05, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 05, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 05, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.