U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Mandate - USCA]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 14, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • February 17, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • February 15, 2022: [Electronic Record Transmitted]
  • February 15, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • February 11, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Hearing]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Hearing]
  • January 11, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 08, 2021: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
  • December 02, 2021: [Inquiry of Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Inquiry of Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Addendum To Violation Report (PostTrial)]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • April 02, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • April 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 23, 2021: [Prob49 - Waiver of Hearing]
  • March 23, 2021: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
  • March 05, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.