U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-00209-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Merritt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Document]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • January 26, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice-other]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Seal ]
  • August 17, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Response]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Seal ]
  • August 03, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit]
  • August 03, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - First Step Act]
  • June 02, 2021: [Motion for Compassionate Release - First Step Act]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Amend/Correct ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Reconsideration ]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.