U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BIO-ADHESIVE ALLIANCE, INC.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 16, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 03, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • June 01, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • May 27, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 21, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 20, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 11, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 23, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • March 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.