U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 24, 2022: [Annual Accounting of Garnishment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • September 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment/Execution and Instructions]
  • July 14, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • July 13, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • July 13, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • March 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 15, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.