U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:06-cr-00282-2
  • Case Name: USA v. LAMONDS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • May 06, 2021: [Quash ]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice to Defendant Debtor]
  • April 12, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Application for Writ by USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.