U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Briscoe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Document]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sentencing ]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Seal ]
  • October 20, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 14, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 14, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 02, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • January 19, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 24, 2021: [Extension of Time]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.