U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tyson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 14, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • March 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 23, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.