U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Colclough
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 14, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • May 05, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.