U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Battle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • November 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 11, 2022: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • November 10, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 10, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 10, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • September 06, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Arrest ]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
  • July 01, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Request]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.