U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - Amendment 821 - Criminal History Category]
  • May 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • May 14, 2025: [Probation Report - Amendment 821 - Criminal History]
  • May 09, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - Amendment 821 - Criminal History Category]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 11, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Protective Order ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 26, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • January 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 22, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Suppress ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 24, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Document]
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • April 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.