U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanders
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Sentencing ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 06, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 04, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.