U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hayes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sentencing ]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 03, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 20, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.