U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Remache
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Sentencing ]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 09, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 08, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 22, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 21, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 21, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.