U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fleming
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Bond Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • November 08, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Document]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 10, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • May 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 30, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.