U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCulloch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • March 01, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Summons Issued ]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Summons Issued ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • November 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • August 12, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
  • April 15, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.