U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. James et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - Amendment 821 - Criminal History Category]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release - First Step Act]
January, 2023
  • January 14, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 13, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Seal ]
  • December 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • October 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Document]
  • August 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 15, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • June 23, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 03, 2022: [Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 25, 2022: [Transcript]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 05, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Preserve ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Preserve ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • January 11, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 11, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 11, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 11, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • December 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 10, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2021: [Release Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • October 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 16, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 14, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • September 09, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 06, 2021: [Transcript]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 04, 2021: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • June 02, 2021: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
May, 2021
  • May 31, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • May 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • May 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • April 15, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 15, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice of Correction]
  • April 08, 2021: [Discovery ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 02, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 29, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 26, 2021: [Expedite ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 19, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 18, 2021: [Stay]
  • March 17, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.