U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fuller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Sentencing ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • August 19, 2021: [Release Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • March 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 17, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.