U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • June 13, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Add Counts]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.