U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ngaruyinka
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Status Conference ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Detention]
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 03, 2022: [Case Reopened ]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Deferral of Prosecution]
  • August 25, 2022: [Deferral of Prosecution]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.