U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chirinos-Castro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Dismiss ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Deferral of Prosecution]
  • November 10, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.