U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. de Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Sealed Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Sealed Document]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 03, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 13, 2022: [Seal]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • October 28, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • June 13, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 13, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 11, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 11, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 16, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 16, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • March 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 16, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.