U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00021-2
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 20, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 14, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 02, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 02, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • March 16, 2021: [Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.