U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Paktiawal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Proposed Order]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Deferral of Prosecution]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 17, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • March 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.