U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burns
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 02, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 03, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 03, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 22, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 16, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.