U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Forney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 29, 2021: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 07, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2021: [Plea Hearing Held - Not Completed]
  • October 04, 2021: [Factual Basis]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 13, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 16, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 16, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.