U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lyons
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 06, 2021: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 07, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 07, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 04, 2021: [Factual Basis]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 13, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 17, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 16, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.