U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Factual Basis]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 22, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 22, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • June 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Factual Basis]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 13, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 13, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 08, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 08, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 18, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 16, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 16, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.