U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowens
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 22, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 22, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 22, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • December 15, 2021: [Factual Basis]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 29, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 24, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 24, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 16, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 16, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.