U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [Order]
  • May 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order of Instructions]
  • May 13, 2025: [Screening Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Vacate (2255)]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Restitution Determination]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 25, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Factual Basis]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance, Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • May 25, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • May 25, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty]
  • May 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice - Out of State Counsel]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty]
  • March 19, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • March 19, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 16, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 16, 2021: [Indictment]
  • March 16, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.