U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00021-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Willie, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • April 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice-other]
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 19, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 19, 2022: [SEALED Appeal Transcript ]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 24, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 21, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 21, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • October 20, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 23, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • September 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 12, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 04, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 01, 2022: [Remark]
  • August 01, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • July 27, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 25, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • July 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 12, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 09, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • June 03, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • May 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 12, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • May 12, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • March 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • March 03, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 02, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 22, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 16, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • October 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2021: [Extension of Time]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Release Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 05, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 05, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 02, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 07, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 07, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 17, 2021: [Status Conference ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Status Conference ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Seal ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 29, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • April 06, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 05, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 05, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • March 17, 2021: [Unseal Indictment]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 17, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Stay]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • March 16, 2021: [Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.