U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez Pereira
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 30, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 30, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 28, 2021: [Factual Basis]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 02, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.