U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [JERS Exhibits]
  • September 06, 2022: [Court Verdict]
  • September 06, 2022: [Bench Trial]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 06, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 02, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 02, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • September 02, 2022: [Exhibit List]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 20, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 11, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2022: [Arrest]
  • March 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 20, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.